Mayeda-Williams v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00009 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/22/2018
Complaint
2
06/22/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/22/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
06/22/2018
Unissued Summons
5
06/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
06/26/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/11/2018
Notice of Appearance
8
07/14/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
9
08/09/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
09/04/2018
Answer to Complaint
11
09/04/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
12
10/04/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
13
10/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
14
10/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
15
11/13/2018
Stipulation
16
11/14/2018
Order on Stipulation
17
11/27/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
18
12/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
19
01/10/2019
ORDER re 14 Motion for Social Security Appeal. The Commissioner's decision is reversed and this matter is remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/10/19.
20
01/11/2019
Judgment
21
04/07/2019
Attorney Fees
22
04/22/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
23
04/23/2019
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.