McAlees v. Colvin
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00245 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 600 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/20/2016
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Mandy M.A. McAlees.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
2
10/20/2016
Civil Cover Sheet.
3
10/20/2016
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mandy M.A. McAlees.
4
10/20/2016
Unissued summons re Defendant SSA
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAO
2 Attachments
5
11/18/2016
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk to issue summons and send to counsel who shall serve on def. Def has 60 days to answer. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/18/16.
11/18/2016
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/01/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
7
12/06/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mandy M.A. McAlees. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 11/28/2016, answer due 1/27/2017.
8
12/08/2016
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Admin rec due w/i 60 days of i/a by def; plf's opening brf due w/i 30 days after filing of agency rec; def's answering brf due w/i 30 day sof svc of plf's opening brf; reply may be filed w/i 14 days after svc of def's brf. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 12/8/2016.
12/08/2016
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket 8, when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/30/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
10
01/17/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Carolyn W. Colvin.
11
01/17/2017
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records Part 1
9
009 Medical Records Part 2
9 Attachments
12
02/16/2017
MOTION for Remand re 8 Order, by Mandy M.A. McAlees.
13
03/17/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Remand re 8 Order, Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
14
03/17/2017
DECLARATION of Justin L. Martin re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Remand re 8 Order, Unopposed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
15
04/19/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re [12] MOTION for Remand re [8] Order, filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
16
04/20/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Howard D. Olinsky. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2318839.) by Mandy M.A. McAlees.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
17
04/25/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 Motion for Remand re 8 Order, Unopposed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendant's Response is accepted as filed on 4/19/2017. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 5/3/2017 to file a Reply. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
20
09/26/2017
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Mandy M.A. McAlees.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
21
09/26/2017
DECLARATION of Howard D. Olinsky, Esq. re [20] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Mandy M.A. McAlees.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Expenses
5
Exhibit E Fee Agreement
6
Exhibit F Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
7
Memorandum In Support
8
Certificate of Service
8 Attachments
22
10/06/2017
RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re [20] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
23
12/27/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE re [16] Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Howard D. Olinsky, at docket [16], is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.