McAlees v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00304 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/26/2018
Complaint
2
12/26/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/26/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
12/26/2018
Unissued Summons
5
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
01/02/2019
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/19/2019
Summons Returned Executed
7
01/29/2019
Notice of Appearance
8
01/30/2019
Summons Returned Executed
9
02/22/2019
Notice of Appearance
10
03/05/2019
Order
11
03/25/2019
Answer to Complaint
12
03/25/2019
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
13
04/20/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
04/29/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
05/08/2019
Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.