McGahan Family Limited Partnership
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00049 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
142
06/27/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
143
08/02/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
144
08/20/2018
Entry of Final Decree
145
08/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
146
08/28/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
09/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
148
09/26/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
149
09/27/2018
Entry of Final Decree
150
11/12/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
151
12/07/2018
Entry of Final Decree
152
12/07/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
153
12/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
154
12/08/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM11)
155
12/08/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
12/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
156
12/27/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
02/19/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
158
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
159
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.