McGuire et al v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-ap-90084 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
06/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
06/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
33
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
34
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.