McLaughlin v. McCloud
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00095 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
6
05/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
7
07/10/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
8
07/10/2018
Supplement
9
08/08/2018
Notice (Other)
10
08/13/2018
Notice (Other)
11
09/12/2018
Notice (Other)
12
09/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
13
09/19/2018
Judgment
14
10/11/2018
Reconsideration
15
10/11/2018
Affidavit
16
10/18/2018
Notice (Other)
17
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
18
10/26/2018
Notice (Other)
11/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/14/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
21
11/29/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
22
12/13/2018
Reconsideration
23
12/13/2018
Notice (Other)
24
12/18/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
25
03/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
26
03/26/2019
Affidavit
27
05/13/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.