McNichols Company v. Bristol General Contractors LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00245 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
109
08/01/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
110
08/14/2018
Status Report
111
08/14/2018
Status Report
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
09/21/2018
Status Report
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
10/24/2018
Status Report
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
12/07/2018
Notice (Other)
118
12/10/2018
Status Report
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
01/17/2019
Stipulation
01/28/2019
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
01/28/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
123
02/13/2019
Stipulation
02/18/2019
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.