Mctier v. eli Lilly and Company et al (jc)
Court Docket Sheet

2:2005-cv-00607 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 513 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/27/2005
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eli Lilly and Company.
2
06/27/2005
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company.
06/30/2005
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for David Larraine, Michael W. Jones, Dandall McTier, Jr, Eli Lilly and Company (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/24/2005
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Larraine, Michael W. Jones, Eli Lilly and Company from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 05-1278. (Filing fee $250.00 receipt number 106793)
1
Exhibit A - Complaint
1 Attachment
06/24/2005
COMPLAINT against David Larraine, Michael W. Jones, Eli Lilly and Company, filed by Dandall McTier, Jr. (NO PDF ATTACHED - SEE DOC. # 3) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/24/2005
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dandall McTier, Jr. (NO PDF ATTACHED - SEE DOC. # 3) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/24/2005
Defendant's Certificate of Removal to State Court
5
07/07/2005
ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/1/2005; directing parties to execute and return the attached consent form no later than 7/21/05; Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 7/7/05.
6
07/12/2005
Summons Issued as to Michael W. Jones; returned to counsel for service.
7
07/15/2005
SUMMONS Returned Executed on Michael W. Jones served on 7/12/2005, answer due 8/1/2005.
8
07/20/2005
Case reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson and Delores R. Boyd. Judge Delores R. Boyd no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
9
08/01/2005
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael W. Jones.
08/01/2005
***Attorney James C. Barton, Jr for Michael W. Jones added. (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
08/03/2005
Joint MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff and by Eli Lilly and Company.
1
Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order
1 Attachment
11
08/09/2005
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay pending MDL transfer; Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/9/05.
12
09/06/2005
Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer ORDER entered 7/21/05 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to the USDC, Eastern District of New York.
09/07/2005
Case transferred to USDC, Eastern District of New York. Entire file with certified copy of docket sheet mailed by CMRRR to Clerk. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/16/2005
Return Receipt Card showing service of transferred MDL file by (no signature) for Clerk, USDC, Eastern District of New York.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.