Me2 Productions Incorporated v. Unknown Parties
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2017-cv-00210 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 246 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/23/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13836560 filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. (submitted by Gregory Collins)
1
Exhibit
2
Civil Cover Sheet)(REW
2 Attachments
2
01/23/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ME2 Productions Incorporated. (submitted by Gregory Collins)
3
01/23/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13836560. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-210-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
01/23/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.

Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading
5
01/23/2017
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/23/2017.
6
01/30/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
7
02/14/2017
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit 1-6
2
Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: cv-17-210-PHX-DGC, cv-17-216-PHX-JWS,cv-17-217-PHX-JZB,cv-17-218-PHX-DJH, cv-17-222-PHX-GMS
2 Attachments
8
03/08/2017
*MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-00210-DGC, 2:17-cv-00216-JWS, 2:17-cv-00217-JZB, 2:17-cv-00218-DJH, 2:17-cv-00222-GMS (Associated Cases: CV-17-00581-PHX-DMF, CV-17-00587-PHX-BSB, CV17-00615-PHX-DKD, CV-17-00622-PHX-ESW, CV-17-00623-PHX-DJH) *Incorrect case numbers entered that are subject to the LR 42 motion. Modified on 3/9/2017 (LSP
1 Attachment
9
03/09/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Terminate Motions. Incorrect case numbers entered that are subject to the LR 42 motion. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. NOTE: You must docket the motion in the lower case number CV-17-210-PHX-DGC and you must enter the new case numbers you want consolidated at both case number prompts. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
10
03/09/2017
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated, ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-17-00581-PHX-DMF, CV-17-00587-PHX-BSB, CV17-00615-PHX-DKD, CV-17-00622-PHX-ESW, CV-17-00623-PHX-DJH
1 Attachment
11
03/17/2017
MOTION for Discovery : Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
12
03/24/2017
MINUTE ORDER: In the interest of judicial efficiency, this case is reassigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow for all further proceedings. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-17-210-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
13
03/28/2017
ORDER: granting the Motions to Consolidate Cases 7, 10 in case 2:17-cv-00210-GMS, re: 2:17-cv-0216-GMS, 2:17-cv-0217-GMS, 2:17-cv-0218-GMS, 2:17-cv-0222-GMS, 2:17-cv-0581-GMS, 2:17-cv-0587-GMS, 2:17-cv-0615-GMS, 2:17-cv-0622-GMS, 2:17-cv-0623-GMS; the Clerk is directed to consolidate these cases with Case No. CV-17-0210-PHX-GMS as the lead case; all future filings shall be filed in the lead case only and captioned as referenced in this order; setting a Status Conference for April 7, 2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/27/17. (Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-00210-GMS et al.)
14
04/07/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 4/7/2017. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Gregory Collins for Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 9:04 AM to 9:19 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
15
04/07/2017
ORDER: granting Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference 11 as set forth in this order (see order for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/7/17.
16
04/17/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time : Motion to Extend Rule 4(M) Service Deadline by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
04/18/2017
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Extend Rule 4(m) Deadline. Plaintiff shall have to and including 7/17/2017 to serve the Summons and Complaint upon all Defendants and comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/18/2017.
18
06/23/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Unknown Parties.
19
06/30/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
20
07/11/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
21
07/12/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time (Second Motion to Extend Rule 4 (M) Deadline) by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
22
07/14/2017
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiff shall have to and including 9/15/2017 to serve the Summons and Complaint upon all Defendants and comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/14/2017.
23
07/24/2017
ORDER: The Clerk of Court has received 651 Motions to Quash in the mail, with no personal identifying information or return address for each of the individual Doe Defendant(s). Because the motions do not comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 11, the individual motions will not be filed. The Clerk of Court shall hold the documents for a period of fourteen (14) days in order to allow Doe Defendant(s) to pick up the documents, if they wish to do so. The Clerk of Court may dispose of the documents without further Order of the Court on August 8, 2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/24/17.
24
08/01/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
25
08/07/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
26
08/08/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Unknown Parties.
27
08/23/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
28
08/29/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
29
09/07/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Unknown Parties.
30
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gorge Amvraus, Unknown Amvraus, Zabdi Salazar, Unknown Salazar filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Lead Case: CV-17-00210-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons Zabdi Salazar
3
Summons Jane Doe Salazar
4
Summons Gorge Amvraus
5
Summons Jane Doe Amvraus) *Modified text/party names on 9/12/2017 (DXD
5 Attachments
31
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Martinez, Unknown Martinez, John McCormick, Unknown McCormick filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Member Case: CV-17-00216-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons Maria Martinez
3
Summons John Doe Martinez
4
Summons John McCormick
5
Summons Jane Doe McCormick) *Modified text/party names on 9/12/2017 (DXD
5 Attachments
32
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Karla Dyson, Unknown Dyson, Graciela Fernandez, Unknown Fernandez, Christopher Rivas, Unknown Rivas filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Member Case: CV-17-00217-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons Karla Dyson
3
Summons John Doe Dyson
4
Summons Graciela Fernandez
5
Summons John Doe Fernandez
6
Summons Christopher Rivas
7
Summons Jane Doe Rivas) *Modified text/party names on 9/12/2017 (DXD
7 Attachments
33
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reyna Rodriguez, Unknown Rodriguez, Michael Joaquin, Ivaylo Bubev, Unknown Bubev filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Member Case: CV-17-00222-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons Reyna Rodriguez
3
Summons John Doe Rodriguez
4
Summons Michael Joaquin
5
Summons Jane Doe Joaquin
6
Summons Ivaylo Bubev
7
Summons Jane Doe Bubev) *Modified text/party names/remove filer on 9/12/2017 (DXD
7 Attachments
34
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sammy Mohammad, Unknown Mohammad, John Dyton, Unknown Dyton, Nistor Buhaianu, Unknown Buhaianu, Melissa Olguin, Unknown Olguin, Jerel Antal, Unknown Antal filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Member Case: CV-17-00581-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons Sammy Mohammad
3
Summons Unknown Mohammad
4
Summons John Dyton
5
Summons Unknown Dyton
6
Summons Nistor Buhaianu
7
Summons Unknown Buhaianu
8
Summons Melissa Olguin
9
Summons Unknown Olguin
10
Summons Jerel Antal
11
Summons Unknown Antal) *Modified text/party names on 9/12/2017 (DXD
11 Attachments
35
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ruth Mendez, Unknown Mendez, Dale Avery, Unknown Avery, Miguel Sallard, Unknown Sallard, John Anderson II, Unknown Anderson filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Member Case: CV-17-00622-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons) *Modified text/party names on 9/12/2017 (DXD
2 Attachments
36
09/07/2017
*AMENDED COMPLAINT against Erika Contreras, Unknown Contreras, Veronica Carreon, Unknown Carreon, Marco Medina, Unknown Medina, Concepcion Rendon, Unknown Rendon filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Member Case: CV-17-00623-PHX-GMS.
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons) *Modified text/party names on 9/12/2017 (DXD
2 Attachments
37
09/08/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleadings 30, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, and 36 have been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header
38
09/13/2017
Summons Issued as to Unknown Carreon, Veronica Carreon, Erika Contreras, Unknown Contreras, Marco Medina, Unknown Medina, Concepcion Rendon, Unknown Rendon. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
39
09/13/2017
Summons Issued as to Gorge Amvraus, Unknown Antal, Ivaylo Bubev, Unknown Bubev, Unknown Buhaianu, Unknown Dyton, Graciela Fernandez, Unknown Mohammad. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
Summons
3
Summons
4
Summons
5
Summons
6
Summons
7
Summons
8
Summons)(BAS
8 Attachments
40
09/13/2017
Summons Issued as to Jerel Antal, Karla Dyson, John Dyton, Unknown Fernandez, Maria Martinez, John McCormick, Melissa Olguin, Unknown Olguin, Unknown Rodriguez. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
Summons
3
Summons
4
Summons
5
Summons
6
Summons
7
Summons
8
Summons)(BAS
8 Attachments
41
09/13/2017
Summons Issued as to Unknown Amvraus, Unknown Anderson, John Anderson II, Dale Avery, Unknown Avery, Nistor Buhaianu, Unknown Dyson, Michael Joaquin, Unknown Martinez, Unknown McCormick, Ruth Mendez, Unknown Mendez, Sammy Mohammad, Unknown Rivas, Reyna Rodriguez, Unknown Salazar, Zabdi Salazar, Miguel Sallard, Unknown Sallard. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
Summons
3
Summons
4
Summons
5
Summons
6
Summons
7
Summons
8
Summons
9
Summons
10
Summons
11
Summons)(BAS
11 Attachments
42
09/13/2017
Summons Issued as to Jerel Antal, Ivaylo Bubev. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
Summons)(BAS
2 Attachments
43
09/14/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
44
09/14/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time (Plaintiff's Final Request to Extend Service Deadline) by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
45
09/15/2017
ORDER granting 44 Final Request to Extend Service Deadline. The Rule 4(m) service deadline is extended from 9/15/2017 to 9/22/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/15/2017.
46
09/15/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons and Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b), Order granting motion to consolidate upon Marco Medina on 9/13/2017.
47
09/15/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Erika Contreras on 9/13/2017.
48
09/15/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Veronica Carreon and Jaime Carreon (fka John Doe Carreon) on 9/13/2017.
49
09/15/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Concepcion Rendon and Juan Rendon (fka John Doe Rendon) on 9/13/2017.
50
09/18/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
51
09/18/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
52
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Christopher Rivas and Angelica Rivas a/k/ Jane Doe Rivas on 9/13/2017.
53
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Karla Dyson and Jeff Dyson a.k.a. John Doe Dyson on 9/13/2017.
54
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Graciela Fernandez and Mark Anthony Fernandez a/k/a John Doe Fernandez on 9/13/2017.
55
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Reyna Rodriguez on 9/13/2017.
56
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Jerel Antal and Jane Doe Antal on 9/13/2017.
57
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon John Dyton on 9/13/2017.
58
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Melissa Olguin on 9/13/2017.
59
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon John Anderson II and Tiffany Anderson a/k/a Jane Doe Anderson on 9/13/2017.
60
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Dale Avery on 9/13/2017.
61
09/20/2017
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint with Exhibits, Order re Motions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) and Order granting motion to consolidate upon Ruth Mendez and Andrew Mendez a/k/a John Doe Mendez on 9/13/2017.
62
09/22/2017
ORDER - Scheduling Conference is set for 12/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/22/2017.
63
09/22/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Party Ivaylo Bubev (previously John and Jane Doe 20 in CV-17-222), Unknown Bubev (previously John and Jane Doe 20 in CV-17-222), Nistor Buhaianu (previously John and Jane Doe 12 in CV-17-581), Unknown Buhaianu (previously John and Jane Doe 12 in CV-17-581), Unknown Dyton (previously John and Jane Doe 8 in CV-17-581), Michael Joaquin (previously John and Jane Doe 12 in CV-17-222), Maria Martinez (previously John and Jane Doe 6 in CV-17-216), Unknown Martinez (previously John and Jane Doe 6 in CV-17-216), John McCormick (previously John and Jane Doe 9 in CV-17-216), Unknown McCormick (previously John and Jane Doe 9 in CV-17-216), Sammy Mohammad (previously John and Jane Doe 5 in CV-17-581), Unknown Mohammad (previously John and Jane Doe 5 in CV-17-581), Unknown Salazar (previously John and Jane Doe 11 in CV-17-210), Zabdi Salazar, Miguel Sallard (previously John and Jane Doe 26 in CV-17-622), Unknown Sallard (previously John and Jane Doe 26 in CV-17-622), Gorge Amvraus (previously John and Jane Doe 3 in CV-17-210) and Unknown Amvraus (previously John and Jane Doe 3 in CV-17-210) terminated.
64
09/27/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Party Christopher Rivas (previously John and Jane Doe 23 in CV-17-217) and Unknown Rivas (previously John and Jane Doe 23 in CV-17-217) terminated.
65
09/27/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Party Dale Avery (previously John and Jane Doe 23 in CV-17-622) and Unknown Avery (previously John and Jane Doe 23 in CV-17-622) terminated.
66
10/03/2017
John Anderson II ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses by John Anderson II.
67
10/04/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 32 Amended Complaint by Graciela Fernandez.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
10/04/2017
Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Jeffrey Antonelli and Melissa Brabender on behalf of Graciela Fernandez. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
10/04/2017
ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Graciela Fernandez shallhave, up to and including, November 3, 2017, in which to file her response to theAmended Complaint (Doc. 32). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/04/2017.
69
10/04/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Antonelli on behalf of Erika Contreras.
70
10/04/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Brabender on behalf of Erika Contreras.
71
10/04/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 36 Amended Complaint by Erika Contreras.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
72
10/04/2017
Concepcion Rendon ANSWER to 36 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Concepcion Rendon.
73
10/05/2017
*AMENDED ANSWER to 36 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Concepcion Rendon. *Modified to correct event type on 10/6/2017
74
10/05/2017
ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: Defendant Erika Contreras shall have, up to and including, 11/3/2017, in which to file her response to the Amended Complaint 36. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/5/2017.
75
10/06/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleadings 66, 72, and 73 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header
76
10/13/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
77
10/26/2017
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Incorporated against Veronica Carreo and Jamie Carreon.
78
10/26/2017
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Incorporated against Melissa Olguin.
79
10/26/2017
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Incorporated against Marco Medina.
80
10/26/2017
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff ME2 Productions Incorporated against Jerel Antal and Jane Doe Antal.
81
10/27/2017
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jerel Antal, Unknown Antal, Unknown Carreon, Veronica Carreon, Marco Medina, Melissa Olguin - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants Veronica Carreon, Jaime Carreon (Unknown Carreon), Melissa Olguin, Marco Medina, Jerel Antal and Unknown Antal.
82
11/03/2017
NOTICE of Settlement by Erika Contreras.
83
11/03/2017
NOTICE of Settlement by Graciela Fernandez.
84
11/07/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Party Unknown Dyson (previously John and Jane Doe 15 in CV-17-217), Graciela Fernandez (previously John and Jane Doe 17 in CV-17-217), Erika Contreras (previously John and Jane Doe 1 in CV-17-623) and Karla Dyson (previously John and Jane Doe 15 in CV-17-217) terminated.
85
12/01/2017
NOTICE of Settlement by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
86
12/11/2017
MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
87
12/12/2017
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melissa Olguin by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit
2
Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment Against Melissa Olguin
2 Attachments
88
12/13/2017
ORDER granting 86 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference currently set forDecember 15, 2017 is vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its motion(s) for default judgment against Defendants in default on or before December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/12/17.
89
12/14/2017
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Marco Medina by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit
2
Text of Proposed Order : Final Default Judgment Against Marco Medina
2 Attachments
90
12/14/2017
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jerel Antal and Jane Doe Antal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit
2
Text of Proposed Order : Final Default Judgment Against Jerel Antal and Jane Doe Antal
2 Attachments
91
12/14/2017
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Veronica Carreon and Jaime Carreon by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit
2
Text of Proposed Order : Final Default Judgment Against Veronica Carreon and Jaime Carreon
2 Attachments
92
12/28/2017
*MOTION to Set Aside Default re: 81 Clerk's Entry of Default by Veronica Carreon (2 pages).(SJF) *Modified to correct event type pursuant to (Doc. 94) on 1/23/2018
93
12/29/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 92 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header
94
01/23/2018
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to treat Defendant Veronica Carreon's Answer (Doc. 92) as a Motion to Set Aside Default. ORDERED directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant Veronica Carreon's Motion (Doc. 92) on or before February 6, 2018. FURTHER ORDERED directing Defendant(s) familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/23/18.
95
01/23/2018
DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER: ORDERED granting the Motions (Docs. 87, 89, 90) as follows: Default Judgment against Defendant Melissa Olguin in the amount of $7,500.00 is awarded in favor of Plaintiff; Default Judgment against Defendant Marco Medina in the amount of $7,500.00 is awarded in favor of Plaintiff; Default Judgment against Defendants Jerel Antal and Jane Doe Antal in the amount of $7,500.00 is awarded in favor of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/23/18.
96
01/26/2018
NOTICE re: Service of Default Judgment Order (Doc. 95) by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
97
02/02/2018
RESPONSE to Motion re: 92 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
98
02/14/2018
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated. Party Ruth Mendez (previously John and Jane Doe 1 in CV-17-622), Unknown Mendez (previously John and Jane Doe 1 in CV-17-622), Concepcion Rendon (previously John and Jane Doe 30 in CV-17-623), Unknown Rendon (previously John and Jane Doe 30 in CV-17-623), Reyna Rodriguez (previously John and Jane Doe 11 in CV-17-222), Unknown Rodriguez (previously John and Jane Doe 11 in CV-17-222), John Anderson, II (previously John and Jane Doe 30 in CV-17-622) and Unknown Anderson (previously John and Jane Doe 30 in CV-17-622) terminated.
99
03/14/2018
ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Set Asdide Default (Doc. 92) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Veronica Carreon and Jaime Carreon (unknown Carreon) is granted. Plaintiff's request for statutory damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504(c) against Defendants in the amount of $15,000.00 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for permanent injunction against Defendants is GRANTED. Defendants are further ORDERED to destroy all illegally obtained copies of Mechanic: Resurrection in their possession, custody, or control, including both electronic files and any copies of Mechanic: Resurrection transferred onto any physical medium or device. Defendants are further ORDERED to delete all software used to exchange unlicensed media content, such as the BitTorrent protocol, or to used make or distribute copies of Mechanic: Resurrection. Defendants are further ORDERED to, in the future, refrain from knowingly and willfully using BitTorrent or any other online media distribution system for copying or downloading content in violation of U.S. copyright law. There is no just reason for delay and therefore this judgment is entered as a final judgment as to the claims of Plaintiff against Defendants in this case. The Clerk is instructed to enter this Final Default Judgment immediately. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/13/18.
100
03/21/2018
ORDER setting a Status Conference for 4/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/21/18.
101
04/06/2018
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 4/6/2018. IT IS ORDERED dismissing this case. APPEARANCES: Gregory Collins for Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 10:32 AM to 10:33 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
102
04/06/2018
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered against Defendants Veronica Carreon and Jaime Carreon. Accordingly, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED as follows: Defendants Veronica Carreon and Jaime Carreon ("Defendants") have willfully infringed the rights of ME2 Productions, Inc. ("Plaintiff") in violation of 17 U.S.C. §501, et seq. Statutory damages are proper and reasonable to compensate Plaintiff and to provide notice and act as a deterrent to others. See, e.g., Sony BMG Music Entm't v. Tenenbaum, 660 F.3d 487, 500 (1st Cir. 2011), cert. denied, (U.S. May 21, 2012). Accordingly, Plaintiff's request for statutory damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504(c) against Defendants in the amount of $15,000.00 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for permanent injunction against Defendants is GRANTED. Defendants are enjoined from, directly or indirectly, infringing Plaintiff's rights in the motion picture Mechanic: Resurrection. Defendants shall not reproduce, copy, distribute, upload, torrent, or otherwise make Mechanic: Resurrection available for public distribution, whether through the internet or otherwise, absent express written permission from Plaintiff. Defendants are further ORDERED to destroy all illegally obtained copies of Mechanic: Resurrection in their possession, custody, or control, including both electronic files and any copies of Mechanic: Resurrection transferred onto any physical medium or device. Defendants are further ORDERED to delete all software used to exchange unlicensed media content, such as the BitTorrent protocol, or to used make or distribute copies of Mechanic: Resurrection. Defendants are further ORDERED to, in the future, refrain from knowingly and willfully using BitTorrent or any other online media distribution system for copying or downloading content in violation of U.S. copyright law. There is no just reason for delay and therefore this judgment is entered as a final judgment as to the claims of Plaintiff against Defendants in this case.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.