Me2 Productions Incorporated v. Unknown Parties
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2017-cv-00222 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 282 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/24/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13840234 filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated (submitted by Gregory Collins).
1
Exhibit
2
Civil Cover Sheet)(KGM
2 Attachments
2
01/24/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ME2 Productions Incorporated (submitted by Gregory Collins).
3
01/24/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13840234. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Roslyn O Silver. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-00222-PHX-ROS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
01/24/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.

Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading
5
01/24/2017
*Entry was filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 1/24/2017
6
01/25/2017
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and file notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/24/2017.
7
01/30/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
8
01/31/2017
ORDER OF RECUSAL: This matter is reassigned by random lot to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-17-00222-PHX-GMS. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/30/17.
9
01/31/2017
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 25, 2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/31/2017.
10
02/14/2017
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit 1-6
2
Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: cv-17-210-PHX-DGC, cv-17-216-PHX-JWS,cv-17-217-PHX-JZB,cv-17-218-PHX-DJH, cv-17-222-PHX-GMS
2 Attachments
11
03/08/2017
*MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-00210-DGC, 2:17-cv-00216-JWS, 2:17-cv-00217-JZB, 2:17-cv-00218-DJH, 2:17-cv-00222-GMS (Associated Cases: CV-17-00581-PHX-DMF, CV-17-00587-PHX-BSB, CV17-00615-PHX-DKD, CV-17-00622-PHX-ESW, CV-17-00623-PHX-DJH) *Incorrect case numbers entered that are subject to the LR 42 motion. Modified on 3/9/2017 (LSP
1 Attachment
12
03/28/2017
ORDER: granting the Motions to Consolidate Cases 7, 10 in case 2:17-cv-00210-GMS, re: 2:17-cv-0216-GMS, 2:17-cv-0217-GMS, 2:17-cv-0218-GMS, 2:17-cv-0222-GMS, 2:17-cv-0581-GMS, 2:17-cv-0587-GMS, 2:17-cv-0615-GMS, 2:17-cv-0622-GMS, 2:17-cv-0623-GMS; the Clerk is directed to consolidate these cases with Case No. CV-17-0210-PHX-GMS as the lead case; all future filings shall be filed in the lead case only and captioned as referenced in this order; setting a Status Conference for April 7, 2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/27/17. (Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-00210-GMS et al.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.