Me2 Productions Incorporated v. Unknown Parties
Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-cv-00622 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 221 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/01/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13972116 filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated (submitted by Gregory Collins).
1
Exhibit
2
Civil Cover Sheet)(KGM
2 Attachments
2
03/01/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ME2 Productions Incorporated (submitted by Gregory Collins).
3
03/01/2017
*Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13972116. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-00622-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
MAG 25 Instructions)(KGM) *Modified to correct case number; NEF regenerated on 3/2/2017 (KGM)(CEI
1 Attachment
4
03/02/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.

Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading
5
03/06/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
6
03/07/2017
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
7
03/09/2017
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated, ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-17-00581-PHX-DMF, CV-17-00587-PHX-BSB, CV17-00615-PHX-DKD, CV-17-00622-PHX-ESW, CV-17-00623-PHX-DJH
1 Attachment
8
03/24/2017
MINUTE ORDER: In the interest of judicial efficiency, this case is reassigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow for all further proceedings. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-17-622-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
9
03/28/2017
ORDER: granting the Motions to Consolidate Cases 7, 10 in case 2:17-cv-00210-GMS, re: 2:17-cv-0216-GMS, 2:17-cv-0217-GMS, 2:17-cv-0218-GMS, 2:17-cv-0222-GMS, 2:17-cv-0581-GMS, 2:17-cv-0587-GMS, 2:17-cv-0615-GMS, 2:17-cv-0622-GMS, 2:17-cv-0623-GMS; the Clerk is directed to consolidate these cases with Case No. CV-17-0210-PHX-GMS as the lead case; all future filings shall be filed in the lead case only and captioned as referenced in this order; setting a Status Conference for April 7, 2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/27/17. (Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-00210-GMS et al.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.