Me2 Productions Incorporated v. Unknown Parties
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2017-cv-01415 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 282 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/08/2017
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14203214 filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated (submitted by Gregory Collins).
1
Exhibit
2
Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ
2 Attachments
2
05/08/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ME2 Productions Incorporated (submitted by Gregory Collins).
3
05/08/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.

Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading
4
05/08/2017
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14203214. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-01415-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
5
05/08/2017
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served.
6
05/09/2017
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/9/2017.
7
05/12/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
8
05/17/2017
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ME2 Productions Incorporated, ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit 1-4
2
Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-17-01415-PHX-DLR, CV-17-01421-PHX-JAT, CV-17-01423-PHX-ESW, CV-17-01427-DGC
2 Attachments
9
07/26/2017
ORDER granting (8) Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer 2:17-cv-01421-PHX-JAT, 2:17-cv-01423-PHX-ESW, and 2:17-cv-01427-PHX-DGC to the undersigned and consolidate those actions with this case. All future filings related to these cases shall be filed in the lead case, 2:17-cv-01415-PHX-DLR, only. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/25/17. (Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-01415-DLR, 2:17-cv-01421-JAT, 2:17-cv-01423-ESW, 2:17-cv-01427-DGC)
10
07/26/2017
ORDER that Plaintiff serve Defendants with the summons and complaint and file with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l), or otherwise show good cause for the failure to timely serve. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action after 8/8/2017 for Plaintiff's lack of service pursuant to Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/26/2017.
11
08/01/2017
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall hold the documents for a period of fourteen (14) days in order to allow Doe Defendant(s) to pick up the documents, if they wish to do so. The Clerk of Court may dispose of the documents without further Order of the Court on 8/14/2017. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/1/2017.
12
08/03/2017
MOTION for Discovery : Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Exhibit 1-2
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
13
08/03/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time : Motion to Extend Rule 4(M) Service Deadline by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
14
08/08/2017
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior toRule 26(f) Conference. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/8/2017.
15
08/08/2017
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Extend Rule 4(m) Deadline. Rule 4(m) service deadline is extended until 11/6/2017. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/8/2017.
16
10/16/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Unknown Parties.
17
11/06/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time : Second Motion to Extend Rule 4(M) Service Deadline by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
18
11/06/2017
ORDER granting 17 Second Motion to Extend Rule 4(m) Deadline. The Rule 4(m) service deadline is extended until 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/6/2017.
19
11/27/2017
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by ME2 Productions Incorporated.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.