MedCallAssist, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00065 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/01/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
03/01/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
03/01/2019
Schedules A-J
3
03/01/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
4
03/01/2019
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
5
03/01/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
03/04/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/04/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
03/04/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
03/04/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Corporation) (BNC Notice)
9
03/04/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
03/04/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
03/15/2019
Employ (CM41)
14
03/15/2019
Declaration
15
03/19/2019
Employ
16
03/20/2019
Income and Expense Report
17
04/01/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
04/01/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
04/03/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
04/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.