Meegan Lynn Welch
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00425 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/14/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
12/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/14/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/14/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
12/14/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
6
12/14/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
12/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
8
12/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
9
12/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
12/18/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
01/11/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
01/11/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/11/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/31/2019
Entry of Appearance
16
02/01/2019
Compel
17
02/01/2019
Hearing
18
02/01/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
02/01/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/05/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
02/06/2019
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/06/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
21
02/26/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
22
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
03/11/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
25
03/19/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
26
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
03/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.