Meeka Lashawn Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05147 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[21] Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-05147-DSC Meeka Lashawn Smith Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: van002 Total Noticed: 24 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Meeka Lashawn Smith, 1651 Hampton Park Drive, Birmingham, AL 35216-6580 9576036 +AC AUTOPAY, 1147 BROADWAY, DENVER CO 80203-2106 9576038 +ATT U-VERSE, % I C SYSTEM INC, PO BOX 64378, SAINT PAUL MN 55164-0378 9576039 +CALLAHAN EYE FOUNDATION, 1720 UNIVRSITY BOULEVARD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35233-1816 9576040 +CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, % CREDIT MANAGEMENT, LP, PO BOX 118288, CARROLLTON TX 75011-8288 9576041 CHECK DEPOT, 64 GREEN SPRINGS AVENUE S, BIRMINGHAM AL 35205 9576042 +CHECK N GO, 1423 GADSDEN HWY STE 139, BIRMINGHAM AL 35235-3154 9576043 +CHILDRENS HOSPITAL, % HOLLOWAY CREDIT SOLUTIONS, PO BOX 6441, DOTHAN AL 36302-6441 9576044 +CORNERSTONE, USDOE, PO BOX 145122, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84114-5122 9576045 +CORNERSTONE/AES, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 2461, HARRISBURG PA 17105-2461 9576046 +CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, 25505 WEST 12 MILE RD, SUITE 3000, SOUTHFIELD MI 48034-8331 9590306 +CornerStone Education Loan Services, P O Box 145123, Salt Lake City, UT 84114-5123 9576053 +THE PARK AT HOOVER, 2135 CENTENNIAL DRIVE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35216-6465 9576054 ++VERITAS INSTRUMENT RENTAL INC, PO BOX 950, PINELLAS PARK FL 33780-0950 (address filed with court: VERITAS INSTRUMENT RENTAL, 12475 44TH ST N, CLEARWATER FL 33762) 9576056 #+YERBY BAUER AUTO SALES, 9833 PARKWAY EAST, BIRMINGHAM AL 35215-7301 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9576037 +Fax: 864-336-7400 Jan 23 2018 02:17:40 ADVANCE AMERICA, 3321 LORNA ROAD STE 7, BIRMINGHAM AL 35216-5449 9576047 +Fax: 614-760-4092 Jan 23 2018 01:57:40 EASY MONEY, 4673 HIGHWAY 280, BIRMINGHAM AL 35242-5086 9576048 +E-mail/PDF: ais.exeter.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jan 23 2018 01:46:23 EXETER FINANCE CORP, PO BOX 166008, IRVING TX 75016-6008 9576049 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jan 23 2018 01:56:25 HSBC BANK NEVADA N.A., % PORTFOLIO RECOVERY, PO BOX 41067, NORFOLK VA 23541-1067 9576050 +E-mail/Text: helen.ledford@nrsagency.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:17 MEDICAL WEST, % NATIOWIDE RECOVERY SERVICE, PO BOX 8005, CLEVELAND TN 37320-8005 9576051 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:28 ORAL FACIAL SURGERY OF AL, % AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PKWY, STE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 9576052 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy_notifications@ccsusa.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:07 THE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, % CREDIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES, 725 CANTON STREET, NORWOOD MA 02062-2679 9576055 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy_notifications@ccsusa.com Jan 23 2018 01:44:07 VICTORIA FIRE CASUALTY, % CREDIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES, 725 CANTON STREET, NORWOOD MA 02062-2679 9577940 +E-mail/Text: legal_bankruptcy@badcock.com Jan 23 2018 01:41:06 W.S.Badcock Corporation, Post Office Box 724, Mulberry, FL 33860-0724 TOTAL: 9 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens Case 17-05147-DSC13 Doc 22 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: lstubblef Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: van002 Total Noticed: 24 _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort3@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 2 Case 17-05147-DSC13 Doc 22 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−002 [Notice of Hearing] (Rev. 05/14) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−05147−DSC13 Meeka Lashawn Smith Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−2956 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING Notice is hereby given that a hearing will be held to consider and act upon the following: 20 − Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km) Date: Tuesday, February 13, 2018 Time: 11:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attorneys should attend all scheduled hearings. If a conflict is known, the Court should be notified immediately. Continuances of non−evidentiary hearings may be granted if all parties consent. Evidentiary hearings will not be continued except for good cause shown. If there is a failure to attend a scheduled hearing, and the Court has not been notified of the reason for the failure, the Court may enter appropriate orders. Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: January 22, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court dls Case 17-05147-DSC13 Doc 22 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/05/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Meeka Lashawn Smith
2
12/05/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith. Modified on 12/6/2017 to correct provisions
3
12/05/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith
5
12/05/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith.
6
12/05/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith.
7
12/05/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith.
8
12/05/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/04/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
9
12/06/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
12/06/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Error in docket event, none of the provisions should have been checked Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
11
12/06/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith.
12
12/06/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith).
13
12/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/07/2017.
14
12/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith). Notice Date 12/08/2017.
15
12/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/08/2017.
16
12/18/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
01/08/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
18
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
19
01/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Meeka Lashawn Smith.
20
01/19/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
21
01/22/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[21] Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.