Megan Lyn McLemore
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00356 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/19/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
10/19/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
10/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
10/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
10/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
10/30/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
11
10/30/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12
10/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/01/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
01/02/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
15
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
01/14/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
01/16/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.