Melanie Latrice Long
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2015-bk-04085 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 271 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/09/2015
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Melanie Latrice Long
3
10/09/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long.
4
10/09/2015
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long.
10/09/2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(15-04085-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18573985. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/09/2015
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long.
6
10/09/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long.
7
10/09/2015
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long.
8
10/09/2015
Debtor Request to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long.
9
10/09/2015
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/04/2015 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/01/2015 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2 (MAM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/02/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/06/2016 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/04/2016.
10
10/09/2015
Composition Letter
11
10/10/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Recovery Management Systems Corporation.
12
10/10/2015
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
13
10/11/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/11/2015.
14
10/11/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Letter). Notice Date 10/11/2015.
15
10/11/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Melanie Latrice Long). Notice Date 10/11/2015.
10/12/2015
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Melanie Latrice Long Case Number 09-01708, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/23/2009, Standard Discharge on 07/22/2009.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/13/2015
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
17
10/15/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/15/2015.
18
10/21/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
19
11/05/2015
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/04/2015.
20
11/10/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial.
21
11/30/2015
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 12/01/2015 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 2 (MAM) Birmingham.
22
12/04/2015
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
23
12/30/2015
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 12/30/2015.
24
01/01/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/01/2016.
25
01/04/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
26
02/24/2016
Trustee Objection to Claim 14 of creditor REVIVER FINANCIAL in the amount of $4639.18 Filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford.
27
02/25/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford). Hearing scheduled 4/5/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
28
02/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/27/2016.
29
04/06/2016
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 14 - the Objection is Sustained and claim number 14 is disallowed as having been filed after the claims bar date. Signed on 4/6/2016 (RE: related document(s) 26 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford).
30
04/08/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/5/2016 9:46:17 AM ]. File Size [ 127 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:21 ]. (RE: Doc #26; Trustee's Objection to Claim #14 of Reviver Financial in the amount of $4,639.18). (adiuser).
31
04/09/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 04/09/2016.
32
04/22/2016
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
1
AFFIDAVIT #
2
NOTE #
3
MORTGAGE #
4
LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT #
5
POST PETITION PAY HISTORY #
6
POST PETITION FEE BREAKDOWN ADDENDUM
6 Attachments
33
04/22/2016
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176,).
04/22/2016
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(15-04085-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19306727. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 32) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/25/2016
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas Tutten, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 5/10/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
04/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/27/2016.
37
05/09/2016
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on a telephone call received on May 9, 2016 from the Movant, this matter is settled and Mr. Tutten to submit a proposed order for entry.) RE: Doc #32; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas Tutten, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
38
05/31/2016
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay. The Debtor's plan payments are increased to $437.00 biweekly. (Related Doc # 32) Signed on 5/31/2016.
39
06/01/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
40
06/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 06/02/2016.
41
06/10/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
42
11/22/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor KOHL'S.
43
11/02/2017
Renewed Motion for Relief from Stay (related documents 32 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) Per Order Entered 05/31/2016 Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan Modification
3 Attachments
44
11/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A (RE: related document(s) 43 Renewed Motion for Relief from Stay (related documents 32 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) Per Order Entered 05/31/2016).
45
11/03/2017
Renewed Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas Tutten, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 43 Renewed Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A). Hearing scheduled 11/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
47
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
48
11/30/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/30/2017 10:31:57 AM ]. File Size [ 516 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:26 ]. (RE: Doc #43; Renewed Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Thomas Tutten, Attorney for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). (adiuser).
49
12/04/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Renewed Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 43) Signed on 12/4/2017.
50
12/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 49 Order on Renewed Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 12/06/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.