Melanie Marie Lindholm
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00323 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/27/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/27/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
3
09/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/27/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/27/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
09/27/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
09/28/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
6
09/28/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
09/28/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
09/28/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/05/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.