Melinda C Sommer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81565 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
doc
05/25/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/25/2018
Statement of Attorney for Debtor in a Chapter 13
doc
05/25/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
doc
05/25/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/25/2018
Employee Income Records
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan
05/25/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13
doc
05/26/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/28/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
44
07/26/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
09/04/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
09/24/2018
Motion to Shorten Time
09/24/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.