Melinda M Smitherman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-01811 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 123 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/26/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Melinda M Smitherman
2
04/26/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
3
04/26/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman
5
04/26/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
6
04/26/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
7
04/26/2017
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman
8
04/26/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
9
04/26/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
10
04/26/2017
Certificate of Service on Composition Documents Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
11
04/26/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/24/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/13/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 08/22/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/23/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/24/2017.
12
04/27/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
04/27/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Melinda M Smitherman Case Number 02-16886, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Southern Bankruptcy Court on 12/05/2002; Case Number 12-00930, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/28/2012, Standard Discharge on 05/31/2012; Case Number 03-09890, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/07/2003, Standard Discharge on 02/19/2004; Case Number 16-04478, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/28/2016, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 02/10/2017.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/27/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
14
04/28/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman).
15
04/28/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 7 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman). Hearing scheduled 5/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
04/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/28/2017.
17
04/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/29/2017.
18
04/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman). Notice Date 04/30/2017.
19
04/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/30/2017.
20
05/05/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
21
05/16/2017
ORDER Denying Signed on 05/16/2017 RE: Doc #7; Debtor's Motion to Extend Automatic Stay.
22
05/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Denying). Notice Date 05/18/2017.
23
05/24/2017
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/31/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, bc)
24
05/31/2017
Meeting of Creditors Not Held 5/31/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
25
06/05/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
26
06/06/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/13/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
27
06/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/08/2017.
28
06/14/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing the clerk is directed to reschedule the section 341 first meeting of creditors for July 12, 2017 at 1:30 PM Further, the hearing on the Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case and the Confirmation Hearing are continued to August 1, 2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed on 6/14/2017 (RE: related document(s) 11, 25.
29
06/14/2017
Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/12/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 7/24/2017.Proofs of Claims due by 8/22/2017.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/23/2017.
30
06/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 06/16/2017.
31
06/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/16/2017.
32
07/19/2017
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
33
07/20/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 07/19/2017. (Ch13troffice, sc)
07/20/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 234.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01811-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (234.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20947531. Fee Amount 234.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/02/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
08/23/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 76.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-01811-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (76.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21076136. Fee Amount 76.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
08/29/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 8/29/2017 (RE: related document(s) 25 Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied).
37
08/30/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
38
08/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 08/31/2017.
39
09/15/2017
Motion to Suspend Payments Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman
40
09/19/2017
Notice and Order on Motion To Modify Plan Payments Signed on 9/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 39 Motion to Suspend Payments filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman).
41
09/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Notice and Order on Motion to Modify Plan Payments). Notice Date 09/21/2017.
42
09/27/2017
Trustee's Objection to (related document(s): 39 Motion to Suspend Payments filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman) Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (Ch13troffice, ul)
43
09/28/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 39 Motion to Suspend Payments filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman, 42 Objection filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 10/24/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
44
09/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/30/2017.
45
10/13/2017
Withdrawal of Claims: 9 Filed by Creditor Speedy/Rapid Cash.
46
10/18/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
47
10/18/2017
Objection to Claim # 10 of Cash Call in the amount of $2600 Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
48
10/19/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 47 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
49
10/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/21/2017.
50
10/26/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR* Order the Objection is sustained in part and the Motion is granted in part. The Debtor's Chapter 13 plan payments are suspended through November 30, 2017. Thereafter, the Debtor shall resume plan payments at the increased amount of $193.00 biweekly. Signed on 10/26/2017 (RE: related document(s) 39 Motion to Suspend Payments filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman, 42 Objection filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). (sva) Modified on 10/30/2017
10/30/2017
Corrective Entry - PDF did not attach - order to be re-entered (RE: related document(s) 50 Order Granting). (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/30/2017
Order the Objection is sustained in part and the Motion is granted in part. The Debtor's Chapter 13 plan payments are suspended through November 30, 2017. Thereafter, the Debtor shall resume plan payments at the increased amount of $193.00 biweekly.- (re-entered to attach PDF) Signed on 10/30/2017 (RE: related document(s) 50 Order Granting).
52
11/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 51 Order Granting). Notice Date 11/01/2017.
53
11/28/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 47 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman). Hearing scheduled 12/5/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
54
11/28/2017
Amended Objection to Claim # 10 of Cash Call in the amount of $2600.00 Filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman.
55
11/29/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 54 Amended Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman). Hearing scheduled 12/5/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
56
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 53 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
57
12/05/2017
Order Sustaining Amended Objection to Claim #10 and claim is disallowed as having been previously discharged in case number 12-00930-BGC7. Signed on 12/5/2017 (RE: related document(s) 54 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Melinda M Smitherman).
58
12/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 57 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 12/07/2017.
59
12/13/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
60
12/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 59 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
61
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 60 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
62
01/08/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 11 of Intercapital Starr in the amount of $9701.08 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
63
01/09/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 62 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
64
01/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 63 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/11/2018.
65
01/24/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[59] Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
66
01/24/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # [59]) Signed on 1/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.