Melisa A Weaver
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80776 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
12/11/2018
Modification of Plan (Trustee Motion)
39
01/30/2019
Limit Notice
40
01/31/2019
Limit Notice
42
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.