Melisa Kor
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80186 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
09/18/2018
Limit Notice
01/08/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
01/15/2019
Limit Notice
63
02/19/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.