Melissha Denise Taylor
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05398 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/29/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Melissha Denise Taylor (Shinn, J.)
2
12/29/2017
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Melissha Denise Taylor. (Shinn, J.)
4
12/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Melissha Denise Taylor. (Shinn, J.)
5
12/29/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Melissha Denise Taylor. (Shinn, J.)
12/29/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-05398-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21555370. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/29/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Melissha Denise Taylor. (Shinn, J.)
7
12/29/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Melissha Denise Taylor. (Shinn, J.)
8
12/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/01/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/09/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/27/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/26/2018.
9
12/31/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
12/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/31/2017.
01/01/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Melissha Denise Taylor Case Number 92-07787, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/16/1992, Standard Discharge on 04/10/1998; Case Number 10-04935, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/17/2010, Standard Discharge on 06/03/2015.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/30/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
12
01/04/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority.
13
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Melissha Denise Taylor). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
14
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
15
01/05/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
16
01/14/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
09/11/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.