Melody L. Fletcher
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81667 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
16
06/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
25
08/03/2018
Approving
33
03/14/2019
Response
03/14/2019
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
03/15/2019
Schedule J
36
03/15/2019
Modify Plan
37
03/15/2019
Incur Debt
38
03/15/2019
Expediting Hearing
39
03/15/2019
Debtor Objection to Claim
44
03/20/2019
Notice of Hearing - Van002

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.