Melody L Houser
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00074 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/02/2017
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Melody l Houser
69
08/29/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
09/12/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
10/01/2018
Approve Settlement (Not Rule 9019)
74
10/01/2018
Approve Settlement
75
10/01/2018
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
76
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
77
10/04/2018
Dismiss Case
78
10/05/2018
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
79
10/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
80
10/05/2018
Certificate of Service
81
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/09/2018
QC Remark Re: Official Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
10/10/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
83
10/27/2018
Certificate of No Objection
10/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
10/30/2018
Dismiss Case
85
11/14/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
86
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
87
12/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.