Melton v. Alaska Career College, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00209 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
74
06/18/2018
USCA Order
75
07/11/2018
USCA Mandate
76
07/13/2018
USCA Order
77
07/23/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
78
07/24/2018
Attorney Fees
79
07/24/2018
Affidavit
80
07/24/2018
Errata
81
07/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
82
07/30/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
83
07/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
84
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
85
08/01/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
86
08/01/2018
Appear
87
08/02/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
08/10/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.