Melville Bertrand Bjorge and Linda Gail Bjorge
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00123 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/29/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/29/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
06/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Substitution of Attorney
doc
06/04/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
doc
06/04/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
06/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Certificate of Service
06/05/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/03/2018
Certificate of No Objection
22
07/05/2018
Relief from Stay
23
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
07/31/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
25
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.