Mercado v. SETERUS INC., AS THE AUTHORIZED SUBSERVICER FOR FE
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-ap-80056 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
08/29/2018
Extend Time
61
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
74
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
75
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
76
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
80
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
81
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
83
01/29/2019
Notice of Hearing-Van200
89
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.