Merculief v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00076 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
75
06/25/2018
Hearing
76
06/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
77
06/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
06/28/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
07/10/2018
Order
81
07/11/2018
Pretrial Order
82
07/13/2018
Response to Order
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.