Michael Carl Starnes and Pamela Elaine Starnes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00321 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
09/26/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
09/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
09/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/27/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
09/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
09/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
09/28/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
10/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
10/05/2018
Entry of Appearance
10/17/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/17/2018
Comply (SA)
16
10/18/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
10/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/30/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
18
10/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/30/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/01/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
20
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
21
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
22
11/09/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
23
11/09/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
24
11/11/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
25
11/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
26
11/13/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
27
11/13/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (CM11)
11/13/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/13/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
11/13/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/13/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
30
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
32
11/28/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01)
11/29/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
11/29/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
34
11/29/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
35
11/29/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
36
11/29/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
37
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
39
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
40
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
41
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
12/04/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
43
12/04/2018
Certificate of Service
12/07/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
12/14/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
12/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
12/14/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
46
12/14/2018
Affidavit of Service
47
12/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
12/31/2018
Certificate of No Objection
01/04/2019
Statement of No Determination of Presumed Abuse (ST2) (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
01/10/2019
Relief from Stay
50
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/16/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
02/01/2019
Generic Motion / Application
52
02/01/2019
Hearing
53
02/01/2019
Certificate of Service
54
02/07/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
02/11/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
56
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
57
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
02/20/2019
Disgorgement
59
02/20/2019
Declaration
60
02/20/2019
Hearing
61
02/22/2019
Certificate of Service
62
02/22/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
63
02/22/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
64
02/22/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
65
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
66
03/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
67
03/08/2019
Extend Time
68
03/14/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
03/14/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
03/19/2019
Undeliverable Mail
70
03/22/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
71
03/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
72
04/02/2019
Undeliverable Mail
73
04/19/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
04/22/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
04/25/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
75
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
76
05/07/2019
Proceeding Memo

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.