Michael Cavanaugh and Ashley Cavanaugh
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81585 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Matrix Filed
17
06/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
20
06/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset
39
12/17/2018
Reopen Case
12/24/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.