Michael Charles Forzley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-00090 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor
05/22/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
07/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
79
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
80
07/25/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
81
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.