Michael Craig Purviance
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

4:2017-bk-00430 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
05/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/25/2018
Dismiss Case (Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
doc
06/01/2018
Dismiss Case
doc
06/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
27
06/18/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
06/19/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.