Michael J. Cox
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-00349 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Michael j. cox
38
08/23/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
39
10/11/2018
Change of Address
10/16/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
11/13/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.