Michael J Roberts and Audrey G Roberts
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

4:2011-bk-00512 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
06/22/2018
Certificate of No Objection
40
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
41
06/25/2018
Avoid Lien
06/26/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/29/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.