Michael Lee Flyum
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00279 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/28/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/28/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
08/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/28/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/28/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
08/28/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/29/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
09/21/2018
Request for Special Notice
13
09/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
10/09/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
15
10/09/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
16
10/09/2018
Certificate of Service
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/17/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
19
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse
20
10/28/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
10/29/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
10/29/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
22
11/06/2018
Certificate of No Objection
23
11/06/2018
Certificate of Service
24
11/06/2018
Relief from Stay
25
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
11/13/2018
Dismiss Case for Abuse (Under 11 USC 707(b)) (CM13)
27
11/13/2018
Declaration
28
11/13/2018
Hearing
11/13/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/13/2018
Certificate of Service
30
11/15/2018
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
31
11/15/2018
Hearing
32
11/16/2018
Certificate of Service
12/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
12/11/2018
Proceeding Memo
34
12/11/2018
Dismiss Case for Abuse Under 11 USC 707(b)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.