Michael Owen Jayne
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00427 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/19/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
12/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/19/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
12/20/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
7
12/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
01/15/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
15
01/18/2019
Request for Special Notice
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/31/2019
Proceeding Memo
17
01/31/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
01/31/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
19
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
02/15/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
21
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
22
02/21/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
02/21/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.