Michael Ray Mullins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00034 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/31/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/31/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
01/31/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
01/31/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/31/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
02/01/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
02/08/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
03/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/23/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
13
04/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
04/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
05/01/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
05/07/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
17
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
05/10/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.