Michael Scott v. Cricket Communications, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

4th Circuit Court of Appeals

2016-02300 (ca4)

COURT ORDER filed [1000143886] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [{{51}}]. Copies to all parties. [16-2300]

Appeal: 16-2300 Doc: 53 Filed: 08/25/2017 Pg: 1 of 1 FILED: August 25, 2017 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FOURTH CIRCUIT ___________________ No. 16-2300 (1:15-cv-03330-GLR) (1:15-cv-03759-GLR) ___________________ MICHAEL A. SCOTT, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Plaintiff-Appellee v. CRICKET COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, f/k/a Cricket Communications, Inc. Defendant-Appellant------------------------------CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Amicus Supporting Appellant ___________________ ORDER ___________________ The court denies the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. No judge requested a poll under Fed. R. App. P. 35 on the petition for rehearing en banc. Entered at the direction of the panel: Chief Judge Gregory, Judge Duncan, and Judge Diaz. For the Court/s/Patricia S. Connor, Clerk

Mandate issued. Referencing: [{{48}}] Judgment Order, [{{47}}] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. [16-2300]

Appeal: 16-2300 Doc: 54 Filed: 09/05/2017 Pg: 1 of 1 FILED: September 5, 2017 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FOURTH CIRCUIT ___________________ No. 16-2300 (1:15-cv-03330-GLR) (1:15-cv-03759-GLR) ___________________ MICHAEL A. SCOTT, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Plaintiff-Appellee v. CRICKET COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, f/k/a Cricket Communications, Inc. Defendant-Appellant------------------------------CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Amicus Supporting Appellant ___________________ MANDATE ___________________ The judgment of this court, entered July 28, 2017, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure./s/Patricia S. Connor, Clerk

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/08/2016
Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. Case manager: RWarren. [16-2300]
2
11/08/2016
DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. [16-2300]
3
11/08/2016
BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/19/2016. Response Brief due 01/20/2017. [16-2300]
4
11/22/2016
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Archis A. Parasharami for Cricket Communications, LLC.[999974347] [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
5
11/22/2016
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Charles Rothfeld for Cricket Communications, LLC.[999974349] [16-2300] Charles Rothfeld
6
11/22/2016
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Matthew A. Waring for Cricket Communications, LLC.[999974350] [16-2300] Matthew Waring
7
11/22/2016
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999974351] [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
8
11/22/2016
DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC. [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
9
11/22/2016
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Benjamin H. Carney for Michael A. Scott.[999974359] [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
10
11/22/2016
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Michael A. Scott. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999974360] [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
11
12/19/2016
BRIEF by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/20/2016. [999990206] [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
12
12/19/2016
Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 12/20/2016. [999990207] [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
14
12/19/2016
APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Cricket Communications, LLC. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 78. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: 1. Entered on Docket Date: 12/22/2016. Received by clerk date: 12/21/2016. [999992767] [16-2300]
15
12/27/2016
AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Ryan L. Bangert, Amicus Curiae of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/28/2016. [999994183] [16-2300] Ryan Bangert
16
12/28/2016
ORDER filed [999994236] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). Copies to all parties. [16-2300]
18
01/06/2017
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Aaron Streett for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.[999999438] [16-2300] Aaron Streett
19
01/20/2017
BRIEF by Appellee Michael A. Scott in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/20/2017. [1000007801] [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
21
02/03/2017
BRIEF by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/06/2017. [1000017312] [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
22
02/13/2017
MOTION by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC to expedite decision, to schedule oral argument. Argument Date or Session:. Date and method of service: 02/13/2017 ecf. [1000022973] [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
23
02/14/2017
CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 5/9/17 - 5/11/17 argument session. Additional copies due: 02/19/2017. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 02/20/2017. [16-2300]
24
02/14/2017
ORDER filed [1000023627] deferring action on Motion to expedite decision filed by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC [22]. Copies to all parties. [16-2300]
28
02/16/2017
Additional copies of the RESPONSE BRIEF received from Michael A. Scott. [16-2300]
30
02/16/2017
Additional copies of the OPENING BRIEF and JOINT APPENDIX received from Cricket Communications, LLC. [16-2300]
26
02/21/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Michael A. Scott to notice requesting response [25], Motion to expedite decision [22], Motion to schedule oral argument [22]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
27
02/23/2017
NOTICE by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC that a reply will be filed.[1000029357]. [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
31
02/28/2017
REPLY by Cricket Communications, LLC to Response [26]. [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
32
03/02/2017
COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America requesting three additional copies of AMICUS BRIEF. Additional copies due 03/06/2017. [16-2300]
33
03/03/2017
Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [16-2300]
34
03/06/2017
CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 05/11/2017. Registration Time: 7:45 - 8:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 8:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [16-2300]
35
03/07/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Michael A. Scott. Counsel arguing: Benjamin H. Carney Answering argument time: 20 minutes [1000037499] [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
36
03/13/2017
Notice issued re: terminating motion to expedite and schedule argument as moot. [16-2300]
37
03/13/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC. Counsel arguing: Charles Rothfeld Opening argument time: 15 Minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 Minutes [1000041471] [16-2300] Charles Rothfeld
38
03/30/2017
MOTION by Appellee Michael A. Scott to supplement Local Rule 28(b) Motion of Michael A. Scott to File Supplemental Material as an Attachment to Plaintiff-Appellee's Brief. Date and method of service: 03/30/2017 ecf. [1000052958] [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
40
04/07/2017
RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cricket Communications, LLC to Motion to supplement [38]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
41
04/10/2017
NOTICE by Appellee Michael A. Scott that a reply will be filed.[1000058854]. [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
42
04/12/2017
REPLY by Michael A. Scott to Motion to supplement [38], Response [40]. [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
43
04/27/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000070353] denying Motion to supplement [38]. Copies to all parties. [16-2300]
44
05/05/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellee Michael A. Scott. [1000077118]. [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
45
05/09/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC. [1000078897]. [16-2300] Archis Parasharami
46
05/11/2017
ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Allyson K. Duncan and Albert Diaz. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. Charles Alan Rothfeld for Appellant Cricket Communications, LLC and Mr. Benjamin Howard Carney for Appellee Michael A. Scott. Courtroom Deputy: Lisa Robertson. [1000080070] [16-2300]
47
07/28/2017
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. [1000127004]. [16-2300]
48
07/28/2017
JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 16-2300 opn.p.arg. Decision: Vacated and remanded. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. Entered on Docket Date: 07/28/2017. [1000127012] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [16-2300]
49
08/01/2017
FEE NOTICE issued to Mr. Archis Ashok Parasharami for Cricket Communications, LLC, Mr. Charles Alan Rothfeld for Cricket Communications, LLC and Matthew A. Waring for Cricket Communications, LLC - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. [16-2300]
50
08/08/2017
DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. USCA Filing Fee Paid (receipt no. 14637099659 Filing Fee: $505.00) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-03759-GLR, 1:15-cv-03330-GLR. [16-2300]
51
08/11/2017
PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Appellee Michael A. Scott. [16-2300] Benjamin Carney
52
08/11/2017
Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1) pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. [16-2300]
53
08/25/2017
COURT ORDER filed [1000143886] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [51]. Copies to all parties. [16-2300]
54
09/05/2017
Mandate issued. Referencing: [48] Judgment Order, [47] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03330-GLR,1:15-cv-03759-GLR. [16-2300]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.