Michael Stephen Persons
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01964 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 244 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
1
05/10/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Michael Stephen Persons
2
05/10/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Michael Stephen Persons.
4
05/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Michael Stephen Persons.
5
05/10/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Michael Stephen Persons.
05/10/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01964-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22054375. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/10/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Michael Stephen Persons.
7
05/10/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Michael Stephen Persons.
8
05/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/13/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/19/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/06/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/13/2018.
9
05/11/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
10
05/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/12/2018.
11
05/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/13/2018.
12
05/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Michael Stephen Persons). Notice Date 05/13/2018.
13
05/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.
14
06/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 06/13/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
15
06/21/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
16
06/21/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
06/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/23/2018.
21
12/27/2018
Transfer of Claim
22
12/27/2018
Transfer of Claim
12/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.