Michael Tyler York and Katelyn Nicole York
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00137 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
06/28/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
06/28/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
07/25/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
17
07/25/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
18
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
08/16/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/16/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
22
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
08/24/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
24
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.