Michael Wayne Banks and Judith Marie Banks
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00406 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
61
06/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
62
06/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
63
10/09/2018
Change of Address
10/09/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
10/18/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
65
10/18/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
66
11/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
67
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
11/28/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.