Michael White
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80859 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Withdrawal
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/05/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/19/2018
Limit Notice
47
09/26/2018
Limit Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.