Michaela Kamalei Phillips
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00258 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/08/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
08/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/08/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
08/08/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
08/08/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
08/08/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/08/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/08/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
08/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/09/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
09/11/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/22/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
16
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
11/01/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
19
11/01/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
11/05/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
21
11/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
12/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
12/13/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
24
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
12/14/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.