Michaelson v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00019 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/14/2018
Complaint
2
12/14/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/14/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
12/14/2018
Unissued Summons
5
12/17/2018
Order
12/17/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/09/2019
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
7
01/09/2019
Notice of Appearance
8
01/10/2019
Order
01/10/2019
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
02/22/2019
Notice of Appearance
10
03/05/2019
Answer to Complaint
11
03/05/2019
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.