Michelle Denise Walker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01560 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 247 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/11/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Michelle Denise Walker
3
04/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Michelle Denise Walker.
4
04/11/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Michelle Denise Walker.
04/11/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01560-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21945848. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/07/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 07/06/2018.
6
04/12/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/12/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Michelle Denise Walker Case Number 02-02520, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/28/2002, Standard Discharge on 07/23/2002.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/12/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 4/12/2018.
8
04/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 04/13/2018.
9
04/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/14/2018.
10
04/17/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor BMW Bank of North America, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
11
04/17/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor BMW Bank of North America, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
12
05/09/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Andre' M Toffel, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 58554.00, Assets Exempt: $ 48662.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 304746.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 304746.00. Debtor appeared. (Toffel, Andre')
13
05/14/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and BMW Financial Services NA. LLC Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC.
14
07/09/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management for Debtor. Financial Management Course due:8/8/2018.
15
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 14 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 07/11/2018.
19
08/01/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.