Michelle Louise Lagonegro and Alfred Lawrence Lagonegro
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00144 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/02/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
05/02/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
05/02/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
05/02/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
05/03/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
05/03/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
10
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
05/07/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
05/10/2019
Request for Special Notice
15
05/16/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
16
05/16/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
05/16/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
18
05/16/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
05/16/2019
Affidavit of Service
20
05/16/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
21
05/16/2019
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
22
05/16/2019
Certificate of Service
05/17/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.