Michelle Renee Miller-Obay
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00022 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/25/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/25/2019
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
3
01/25/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
01/25/2019
Credit Counseling Waiver Requested (109(h)) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/25/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
01/25/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/25/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
6
01/25/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
01/25/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
01/25/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/28/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/29/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/04/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/08/2019
Schedules A-J
17
02/08/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
18
02/08/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
19
02/08/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
20
02/08/2019
Extend Time
21
02/08/2019
Support Documentation
22
02/15/2019
Extend Time
23
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/19/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/04/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
25
03/05/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
03/05/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
03/13/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
28
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
29
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
03/19/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
03/20/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
31
03/20/2019
Comply (SA)
03/20/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/02/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
04/15/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
35
04/15/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
04/15/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
04/15/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
04/17/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
04/25/2019
Entry of Appearance
38
04/25/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
39
05/02/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
40
05/02/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.