Mildred Corentha Wafford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00201 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
09/05/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case (Fee) (CM20)
34
09/05/2018
Appoint Trustee (CM05)
41
10/01/2018
Employ (CM41)
42
10/01/2018
Declaration
43
10/01/2018
Employ
44
10/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
11/20/2018
Employ (CM41)
46
11/20/2018
Declaration
11/21/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
11/21/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
48
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
49
12/11/2018
Letter
50
12/11/2018
Undeliverable Mail
51
12/13/2018
Employ
52
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
53
01/22/2019
Undeliverable Mail
54
03/26/2019
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
55
03/26/2019
Abandon (Fee) (CM10)
03/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
03/30/2019
Hearing
57
04/09/2019
Substitution of Attorney
58
04/09/2019
Change of Address
04/10/2019
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
Update Hearing for JRP / Calendar (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
04/23/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
04/29/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
05/01/2019
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
61
05/02/2019
Proceeding Memo
62
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
63
05/07/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
64
05/08/2019
Generic Motion / Application
65
05/08/2019
Non-Opposition
66
05/10/2019
Generic Motion
05/10/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.