Miller v. Colvin

3:2016-cv-00177 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 396 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/12/2016
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Jeanette Elaine Miller.
1
Exhibit A - Letter from SSA
1 Attachment
2
08/12/2016
Civil Cover Sheet.
3
08/12/2016
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeanette Elaine Miller.
4
08/12/2016
Unissued summons re Defendant C. Colvin
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAO
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG
2 Attachments
5
08/17/2016
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: The Application to Waive Filing Fee, at docket 3, is GRANTED. Service of process to be completed within 90 days of the date the Complaint was filed. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/16/16.
08/17/2016
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/01/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
7
09/02/2016
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/2/16.
09/02/2016
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket 7, when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/07/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Daphne Banay on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin
9
09/12/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeanette Elaine Miller. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 8/31/2016, answer due 10/31/2016.
10
10/31/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Carolyn W. Colvin.
11
10/31/2016
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records Part 1
9
009 Medical Records Part 2
9 Attachments
12
10/31/2016
Notice to Counsel re 11 Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security). A review of the document submitted at dkt 11 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 11. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page.
13
11/29/2016
MOTION reverse agency decision re 12 Notice Re: Chamber Copy, 11 Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security), 1 Complaint Social Security appeal by Jeanette Elaine Miller.
14
12/19/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION reverse agency decision re 12 Notice Re: Chamber Copy, 11 Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security), 1 Complaint Social Security appeal filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.
03/08/2017
Docket Annotation: Nancy A. Berryhill; Acting Commissioner of Social Security, represented by Daphne Banay and Richard L. Pomeroy substituted for Carolyn W. Colvin (Acting Commissioner of Social Security) pursuant to FRCvP 25(d)(1) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
04/03/2017
ORDER granting in part 13 Motion for Reversal and Remand. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/3/17.
16
04/03/2017
JUDGMENT: This matter is REMANDED to the SSA for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/3/17.
17
04/20/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Howard D. Olinsky. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2318823.) by Jeanette Elaine Miller.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
18
05/09/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE re 17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Howard D. Olinsky, at docket 17, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
19
06/29/2017
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Jeanette Elaine Miller.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
20
06/29/2017
DECLARATION of Howard D. Olinsky, Esq. re [19] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Jeanette Elaine Miller.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Expenses
5
Exhibit E Fee Agreement
6
Exhibit F Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
7
Memorandum In Support
8
Certificate of Service
8 Attachments
21
07/10/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re [19] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Nancy A. Berryhill.
22
08/01/2017
ORDER granting [19] Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/1/17. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.